Accounts and annual returns West Cornwall Methodist Circuit

Charity number: 1135689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window