Trustees West Cornwall Methodist Circuit

Charity number: 1135689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

40 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RALPH HENRY WARD Chair 01 September 2021
CHAPEL STREET METHODIST CHURCH PENZANCE
Received: On time
Laura Newton Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Christine Elizabeth Blakey Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Sylvia Pezzack Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
David Linley Jackson Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Doreen Hocking Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Rev Marion Lumbers Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
David John Peters Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Mary Meyers Trustee 27 February 2019
None on record
Desmond Harry Hosken Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Karen Curnow Trustee 01 September 2018
THE JOHN THOMAS MATTHEWS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Edwin Myers Trustee 01 September 2018
THE JOHN THOMAS MATTHEWS TRUST
Received: On time
Linda Jane Stevens Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
MARY PRESCOTT Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Edward Charles Paynter Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Marjorie Kells Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
Miriam Harriet Cox Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
GODFREY STEVENS Trustee 16 August 2017
None on record
Mr Michael Williams Trustee 24 March 2017
None on record
Mr Tony Jasper Trustee 07 February 2017
CHAPEL STREET METHODIST CHURCH PENZANCE
Received: On time
ACG LIMITED
Overdue by 6 days
Brenda Clarke Trustee 19 February 2015
None on record
Mrs Mandy Pearce Trustee 10 December 2013
None on record
MR JOHN BENNETTS Trustee 03 April 2013
None on record
ALISON WALLIS Trustee 13 March 2013
None on record
ELIZABETH EDDY Trustee 27 June 2012
None on record
MRS NIKKI JONES Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record
PETER TREVITHICK HARVEY Trustee 08 December 2011
None on record
STUART LESLIE WILLIAM MEYERS Trustee
None on record
MR EDWIN MURLEY Trustee
None on record
CLIVE HARROLD Trustee
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Recently registered
PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB
Received: On time
BOSENCE FARM COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Overdue by 6 days
GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)
Received: On time
PENGARTH TALKING NEWSPAPER
Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH BENNETTS Trustee
CHAPEL STREET METHODIST CHURCH PENZANCE
Received: On time
JENNIFER MARY HARROLD Trustee
PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB
Received: On time
MR JERRY DREW Trustee
3 VILLAGES YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
NEWLYN TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 1 day late
Marjorie Jeanne TAYLOR Trustee
NEWLYN TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 1 day late
LINDA MARY STEVENS Trustee
None on record
SUSAN HELEN MAJOR Trustee
None on record
MRS MARY EDDY Trustee
CORNWALL GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CHRISTINE MARY GENDALL Trustee
None on record
GEORGE ANTHONY BODILLY Trustee
None on record
BRONWEN MARY ROWLAND Trustee
ST JUST MINERS' CHAPEL
Received: On time