HINDSFORD COMMUNITY LINK (NW) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to provide low cost quality childcare for the local community. We follow the Early Years Foundation Stage to provide quality experiences for all our children. All grants given by local government for 3 and 4 year olds is spent on giving our children the best play equipment, resouces and environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £208,924 from 6 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 19 February 2010: Standard registration
- 21 February 2012: Funds received from 1098596 HINDSFORD COMMUNITY LINK LTD
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA WORRALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARRIE MORROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA JANE MILLIKEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.88k | £258.23k | £334.08k | £376.59k | £368.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.29k | £266.71k | £342.56k | £385.07k | £376.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £184.13k | £217.22k | £194.92k | N/A | £208.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE QUALITY DAY CARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY AGE. OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHTS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUPS. THE CHARITY WILL ENSURE ALL SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS AND WILL ACT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HINDSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
HINDSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
LODGE ROAD
ATHERTON
MANCHESTER
M46 9BL
- Phone:
- 01942 871498
- Email:
- hindsfordlink@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
hindsfordnursery.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window