MW (CL) FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pursue the objects of the charity with all the resources available to the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
- M W FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- MW (HO) FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avi Sharman | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
GERALD LEWIN | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
VIVIENNE LEWIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £549.69k | £569.25k | £307.18k | £509.33k | £402.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.66k | £252.87k | £244.14k | £243.73k | £433.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £118.00k | £407.77k | N/A | £306.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £431.69k | £161.48k | N/A | £202.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £239.15k | £217.86k | N/A | £175.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £37.51k | £35.01k | N/A | £68.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.16k | £2.16k | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £236.85k | £215.00k | N/A | £172.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £37.51k | £35.01k | N/A | £68.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AROUND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS, OR BY GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORLD-WIDE THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS M NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (3) TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION WORLD-WIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CODE OF JEWISH LAW (SHULCHAN ARUCH)
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 PRINCES PARK AVENUE
LONDON
NW11 0JT
- Phone:
- 02084582933
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window