Accounts and annual returns YOUTH DROP IN GROUP

Charity number: 1136481
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2022 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required