YOUTH DROP IN GROUP

Charity number: 1136481
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £3.50k £14.83k £2.47k £280 £0
Total expenditure £3.89k £6.90k £9.98k £710 £137
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A