Financial history ANDOVER PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1135042
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £206.69k £183.61k £122.61k £122.39k £135.64k
Total expenditure £196.08k £154.25k £144.68k £157.00k £130.35k
Income from government contracts £181.04k £117.49k £103.63k £103.20k £123.05k
Income from government grants £2.26k £62.80k £282 £1.28k £2.03k