THE CAPRICORN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1135174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required