THE CAPRICORN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1135174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £49 £435.60m £1.65m £3.33m £2.86m
Total expenditure £11.28k £447.00k £34.85m £187.10m £6.57m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £435.32m £0 £0 £560.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £560.00k
Income - Investment N/A £113.00k £1.61m £3.31m £2.81m
Income - Other N/A £163.00k £37.00k £15.00k £52.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £435.32m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £323.00k £34.33m £186.35m £5.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £124.00k £515.00k £744.00k £796.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £132.00k £0 £192.00k £139.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £191.00k £34.33m £186.16k £5.64m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £124.00k £515.00k £744.00k £796.00k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0