OGROSHOR BENGALI WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity number: 1137049
Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Annual return 30 November 2018 02 October 2020 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 24 October 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 02 January 2017 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required