OGROSHOR BENGALI WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity number: 1137049
Charity reporting is overdue by 391 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018
Total gross income £4.70k £1.44k £1.05k £876 £748
Total expenditure £3.26k £390 £172 £128 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A