BEIS TRANA SCHOOL OF LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 1135122
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.26m £544.29k £833.96k £1.22m £1.21m
Total expenditure £2.16m £575.51k £853.35k £920.50k £942.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £136.80k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.22k £36.61k £0 £189.64k £235.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.97m £155.84k £221.25k £451.16k £284.25k
Income - Other trading activities £287.48k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £388.45k £427.78k £504.07k £562.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3 £0 £184.93k £262.13k £361.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £406.88k £550.40k £776.48k £917.61k £941.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £15.10k £39.37k £2.89k £767
Expenditure - Governance £40.22k £0 £19.24k £32.78k £48.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.70m £10.00k £37.50k £0 £0