EMMANUEL COMMUNITY PROJECTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1137387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.19k £16.79k £16.08k £16.42k £16.79k
Total expenditure £20.80k £16.73k £13.69k £17.41k £18.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £500