THE COLOMA TRUST

Charity number: 1136025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time Download