THE COLOMA TRUST

Charity number: 1136025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £453.00k £0 £0 £75.00k £0
Total expenditure £301.20k £13.97k £121.29k £1.93k £1.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £453.00k £0 £0 £75.00k N/A