FEROZ KHAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1136462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 December 2019 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 April 2018 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 April 2018 537 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required