FEROZ KHAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1136462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.76k £5.63k £1.87k £1.96k £1.31k
Total expenditure £4.31k £4.79k £7.06k £2.50k £172
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A