FURQAAN AL-HUDAA

Charity number: 1135943
Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required