Accounts and annual returns JALALABAD ISLAMIC AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1138144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 July 2023 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 July 2023 720 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 April 2023 977 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1813 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1813 days