Financial history JALALABAD ISLAMIC AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1138144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £1.05k £15.24k £16.44k £16.76k £18.17k
Total expenditure £10.08k £133.35k £12.62k £13.86k £14.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A