THE KNIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £8.32k £65.43k £300 £6.69k
Total expenditure £5.87k £8.79k £51.45k £4.52k £7.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A