Trustees The Croydon 60+ Benevolent Fund Limited

Charity number: 1136734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Gilbert Davis Chair 20 April 2021
None on record
ALEXANDER JOHN CHEETHAM Trustee 24 August 2022
ELEANOR SHORTER FOR PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATION GROUNDS
Received: On time
Nuala Catherine O'Neill Trustee 24 August 2022
None on record
Peter Leonard Spalding Trustee 22 August 2022
None on record
EDWARD HANDLEY Trustee 14 May 2021
None on record
Loraine Kay Davis Trustee 22 April 2021
None on record
Oumaduth Sauba Trustee 29 March 2021
AGE UK CROYDON
Received: On time
WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE
Overdue by 140 days
WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE
Recently registered
STEPHEN KIRKMAN Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
Stephen Kirkman Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record