Accounts and annual returns THE CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM ST MICHAELS CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1136247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 20 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 October 2020 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 08 October 2020 313 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 05 November 2019 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 05 November 2019 340 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 21 May 2018 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 21 May 2018 172 days late Download Open in new window