TOWY COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1136394
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k £0 N/A N/A
Other income £803.65k £865.27k £939.64k £1.06m £1.11m
Total expenditure £859.53k £900.51k £949.50k £1.09m £1.10m