Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY AMBASSADORS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1137338
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 February 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window