Financial history BLUE MARINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.08m £4.19m £4.05m £6.31m £7.79m
Total expenditure £2.05m £3.36m £3.62m £4.16m £6.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.02k £97.02k £11.67k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04m £4.12m £4.03m £8.31m £7.76m
Income - Other trading activities £10.22k £62.00k £9.64k £5.42k £9.54k
Income - Charitable activities £38.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £2.00m £0
Income - Investment £386 £2.93k £3.30k £418 £16.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.97m £3.18m £3.41m £3.99m £6.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.17k £180.30k £213.10k £166.89k £167.17k
Expenditure - Governance £106.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £797 £37 £0