Financial history 1 MORECHILD

Charity number: 1136112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £255.57k £171.11k £143.59k £136.66k £67.23k
Total expenditure £195.85k £185.00k £262.15k £113.22k £141.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A