Accounts and annual returns THE PARK THEATRE

Charity number: 1137223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window