Financial history THE PARK THEATRE

Charity number: 1137223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.28m £1.79m £1.78m £2.15m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.70m £1.90m £2.05m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £11.72k £6.50k £27.17k £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £234.51k £431.01k £288.59k £283.83k £1.49m
Income - Other trading activities £500.27k £507.99k £982.58k £886.46k £8.96k
Income - Charitable activities £544.00k £848.54k £506.34k £983.63k £61.22k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £222 £96 £2 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £667.37k £847.46k £990.99k £1.24m £907.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £682.52k £849.70k £905.48k £809.38k £278.58k
Expenditure - Governance £74.12k £45.80k £104.05k £0 £41.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0