Accounts and annual returns Centre for Governance and Scrutiny

Charity number: 1136243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window