Financial history Centre for Governance and Scrutiny

Charity number: 1136243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £837.23k £745.67k £832.50k £617.69k £571.93k
Total expenditure £984.33k £798.76k £729.39k £548.84k £531.47k
Income from government contracts £329.20k £160.52k £17.85k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £329.20k £8.10k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.62k
Income - Other trading activities £507.64k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £329.20k £744.81k £831.57k £617.69k £567.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.62k
Income - Investment £0 £852 £935 £0 £315
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £907.20k £798.76k £729.39k £548.84k £531.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £77.13k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0