Trustees Centre for Governance and Scrutiny

Charity number: 1136243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord Robert Walter Kerslake Chair 01 June 2015
THE DAVID AND JANE RICHARDS FAMILY FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
NEW ECONOMICS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ACADEMY OF SOCIAL SCIENCES
Received: On time
Graeme Coombes Trustee 10 August 2021
None on record
Juliet Baker Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Radhika Vaidya-Sahdev Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Andrew Noel Burns Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Caraline Ann Johnson Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
Dr Catherine HOWE Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Jonathan Chasey CARR-WEST Trustee 24 June 2013
None on record
Helen Ruth Bailey Trustee 31 January 1999
None on record