WHOLE PLANET FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whole Planet Foundation's mission is poverty alleviation through microcredit in communities worldwide that supply Whole Foods Market stores with products. The foundation provides grants to microfinance institutions in Latin America, Africa and Asia who in turn develop and offer microenterprise loan programmes, training and other financial services to the self-employed poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Malawi
- Scotland
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 September 2010: Standard registration
- 29 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.91k | £120.65k | £108.31k | £66.11k | £63.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.97k | £130.93k | £93.28k | £4.60k | £155.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 December 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 December 2020 | 50 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 26 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 26 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UNDEVELOPED OR DEVELOPING WORLDS BY: (A) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF MICRO-LENDING PROJECTS AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP; AND (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) EDUCATION AND SCHOOLS, WATER SUPPLY, PUBLIC HEALTH AND TRANSPORTATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window