Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST ROCK OF AGES PARISH

Charity number: 1138577
Charity reporting is up to date (172 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 March 2022 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 January 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 17 January 2020 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 31 October 2018 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 31 October 2018 31 days late
Annual return 30 November 2016 17 January 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 17 January 2018 109 days late Download Open in new window