ANIMAL WELFARE AND RESCUE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1136726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2019 11 May 2021 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 August 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 05 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required