Financial history THE LAND RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1138337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.24m £7.09m £15.98m £9.77m £10.38m
Total expenditure £6.46m £6.24m £6.47m £8.06m £7.18m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £311.00k £94.00k £7.63m £1.53m £1.01m
Income - Donations and legacies £21.00k £7.00k £7.00k £1.34m £32.00k
Income - Other trading activities £382.00k £381.00k £399.00k £2.19m £515.00k
Income - Charitable activities £819.00k £900.00k £940.00k £1.11m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £1.30m £0
Income - Investment £5.34m £5.13m £5.73m £5.90m £6.30m
Income - Other £8.68m £674.00k £8.90m £529.00k £2.36m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.09m £5.81m £6.05m £7.57m £6.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £371.00k £428.00k £421.00k £485.00k £496.00k
Expenditure - Governance £38.00k £43.00k £42.00k £60.00k £44.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £371.00k £428.00k £421.00k £485.00k £496.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0