THE LAND RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1138337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Louise Brooke-Smith Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR Janet Haddock-Fraser Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
Patrick Anthony Richards Aylmer Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
Anthony Bickmore Trustee 15 June 2017
WILLIAM KENDALL'S CHARITY (WAX CHANDLERS COMPANY) Received: On time
THE WAX CHANDLERS' CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Nicholas McLeod-Clarke Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
WILLIAM JOHN HISCOCKS Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
Sandra Kelly Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
Jonathan Irvine Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
Tom Keevil Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Dr Nicholas Taylor Buck Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
Sarah Jane Whitney Trustee 10 July 2014 None on record
Deborah Rees Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record