Dogfen lywodraethu THE HAVEN COMMUNITY PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE OR SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WHICH ENCOURAGE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ALCOHOL, DRUG AND SOLVENT ABUSE (AND THE CONSEQUENT EFFECTS OF SUCH ABUSE) AND TO THE EFFECTS OF CRIME GENERALLY; TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A SAFER AND INCREASED QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIMINAL ACTS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AMONG THE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND WORK EXPERIENCE; THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE WELSH HOUSE FARM ESTATE IN BIRMINGHAM.
Maes buddion
BIRMINGHAM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.