BOOMERANG (NW) LIMITED

Charity number: 1140790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 December 2019 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 11 December 2019 72 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 04 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 04 August 2017 On time Download