BOOMERANG (NW) LIMITED

Charity number: 1140790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £177.89k £145.79k £150.28k £152.52k £112.13k
Total expenditure £199.76k £182.36k £179.31k £173.86k £161.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A