AL - RAZA ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1140217
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required