Financial history THE OASIS CENTRE - CORNWALL

Charity number: 1139355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.60k £37.68k £39.67k £46.97k £47.94k
Total expenditure £30.08k £36.01k £36.07k £34.31k £39.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A