Trustees THE OASIS CENTRE - CORNWALL

Charity number: 1139355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma King Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Michael PAUL Johns Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Barbara Mary Wyper Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Anne Margaret Clare Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Barbara Lesley Hough Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Pat Walton Trustee
None on record
Pauline Turner Trustee
None on record