Accounts and annual returns THE HEDERA CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1139607

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window