SARRATT AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1139443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN LESLIE PLUMMER BEM Trustee
SARRATT VILLAGE HALL Received: 14 days late
Pamela Bushell Trustee 03 May 2017 None on record
MRS SUE BUSSEY Trustee None on record
Benjamin Michel Trustee 06 May 2015 None on record
GILLIAN FAY Trustee None on record
MR DON SUTTON Chair None on record
Mary Penelope Bulgin Trustee 06 May 2015 None on record
JEAN MARY MACHIN Trustee 07 May 2014
THE HERTFORD COUNTY ASSOCIATION OF CHANGE RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND Received: On time
Janet Taylor Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
SUSAN CHRISTINA ROBERTS Trustee None on record
KERRY JAMES Trustee 06 May 2015 None on record
Sally Jennifer Lewis Trustee 08 May 2019 None on record