Accounts and annual returns AQUIVA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1141594
Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 575 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 940 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 940 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1306 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 February 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required