Accounts and annual returns HOME-START CHICHESTER & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1123768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window