EDUCATORS FORUM

Charity number: 1124910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.52k £9.05k £14 £0 £0
Total expenditure £17.13k £11.64k £748 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A