THE COMPANY MUSIC THEATRE

Charity number: 1124395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 19 January 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 09 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required