Accounts and annual returns HC DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity number: 1127786
Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 249 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 249 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 614 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 614 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 980 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 980 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1345 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1345 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1710 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1710 days